House
|
06/16/2021
|
Effective date: 08/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/16/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 407.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 563 reported by the Committee on Education (9-0).
|
|
|