House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 47. Failed to pass, motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/12/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|