House
|
06/14/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/09/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 28 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 94, nays 2. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|