House | 06/14/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2021 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2021 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 89, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Rules suspended. |