House
|
06/01/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/25/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|