House | 06/14/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2021 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. |