House | 06/14/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021. | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |