House
|
06/01/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 102, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 11 for 5/27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Made Special Order of the day No. 9 for 05/06/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably (20-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|