House
|
06/09/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 8 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|