House | 05/27/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/20/2021. | ||
House | 05/18/2021 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Scheduled for concurrence on 05/11/2021. | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |