House
|
06/14/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 11, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 60, nays 34. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|