LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR68
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HCR68
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2021 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HCR68
Action History
House
05/26/2021
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 43, nays 57. Failed to pass.
House
05/25/2021
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
House
05/18/2021
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/17/2021
Reported with amendments (12-0).
House
05/10/2021
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
House
05/06/2021
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.