House
|
06/15/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice the Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
The Senate recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House recommitted the report to the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Fred Mills, Luneau, and Mizell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Bagley, and Carrier.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|