House
|
06/09/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/09/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|