House
|
06/14/2021
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Hewitt, Milligan, and Harris.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Schexnayder, Stefanski, and Duplessis.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|