House | 05/27/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 63, nays 28. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/19/2021 | Reported with amendments (8-0). | ||
House | 04/13/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 04/12/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |