House | 06/09/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 84, nays 5. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/03/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021. | ||
House | 06/03/2021 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/03/2021 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 06/03/2021 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |