House | 05/27/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/24/2021 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2021. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/12/2021 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/03/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |