House | 06/03/2021 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2021. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/26/2021 | Reported favorably (15-0). | ||
House | 05/11/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/10/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |