LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2021 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR9
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR9
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2021 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR9
Action History
House
04/27/2021
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
04/26/2021
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2021.
House
04/26/2021
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/22/2021
Reported favorably (12-0).
House
04/13/2021
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
House
04/12/2021
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.