Senate
|
06/11/2021
|
Effective date 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 207.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|