House
|
07/20/2021
|
Notice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
By a vote of 23 yeas and 15 nays, the motion to override the Governor's veto failed to be adopted. Motion to reconsider laid on the table.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported with amendments (6-4). To be recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
By a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|