Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|