Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
Effective date 6/14/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 287.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice the House discharged the Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Notice Senate has discharged from Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
By a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Senate Conference Committee members discharged.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Bishop, DeVillier, and Riser.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Allain, Ward, and Lambert.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/19/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Reported with amendments (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 04/20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|