Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Effective date 6/4/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 55.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2021
|
Reported favorably (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2021
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|