Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Effective date 6/21/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 437.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 11. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported with amendments (9-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|