House
|
07/20/2021
|
Notice Senate's motion to override the Governor's veto failed to pass.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
By a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays, the motion to override the Governor's veto failed to be adopted. Motion laid on table.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/20/2021
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2021
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 68, nays 27. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Reported favorably (7-6-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2021
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|