Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
Effective date 6/14/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 296.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|