Senate | 06/01/2021 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/28/2021. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2021 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/25/2021 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 60 yeas, 35 nays. | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2021. | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2021 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |