Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 101 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
By a vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 57th calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Reported favorably (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported favorably (11-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported without action.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2021
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|