Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 95 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2021
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|