Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 102 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/07/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|