2021 Regular Session ENROLLED SENATE CONCURRENT RESOL UTION NO. 68 BY SENATOR MIZELL A CONCURRENT RESOL UTION To extend the term of the Task Force on Benefits of Marriage and Incentives for Premarital Counseling and Pre-Divorce Counseling that was created to study the benefits of marriage and the possible incentives to promote premarital counseling and pre-divorce counseling and to make policy recommendations to the legislature. WHEREAS, pursuant to Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 107 of the 2019 Regular Session of the Louisiana Legislature, the legislature created the Task Force on Benefits of Marriage and Incentives for Premarital Counseling and Pre-Divorce Counseling to conduct a study of the issues related to the benefits of marriage on individual men, women, and children, and on society as a whole and to study the impact that incentives for premarital and pre-divorce counseling have on the reduction of divorce and to make policy recommendations to the legislature regarding legislation that the task force may deem appropriate to address the issues studied by the task force; and WHEREAS, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 107 of the 2019 Regular Session of the Louisiana Legislature sets forth that the task force is to report its findings and recommendations, including any suggestions for legislation, to the legislature no later than December 28, 2020; and WHEREAS, Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 107 of the 2019 Regular Session of the Louisiana Legislature sets forth that the task force will cease to exist on December 31, 2020 which was extended by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 71 of the 2020 Regular Session of the Louisiana Legislature to December 31, 2021; and WHEREAS, the task force determined that additional time is required to study fully all of the issues related to the benefits of marriage and incentives for premarital and pre-divorce counseling and to prepare and submit its report to the legislature. Page 1 of 2 SCR NO. 68 ENROLLED THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby extend the Task Force on Benefits of Marriage and Incentives for Premarital Counseling and Pre-Divorce Counseling created by Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 107 of the 2019 Regular Session of the Louisiana Legislature and provides that the task force membership and functions shall be as set forth in that Resolution. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby extend the deadline by which the task force is to submit its report to the legislature to not later than December 28, 2022, and the task force shall cease to exist on December 31, 2022. PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Page 2 of 2