House | 06/03/2021 | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 06/02/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021. | ||
House | 06/01/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 05/27/2021 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Reconsidered. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 2 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2021 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |