Senate | 06/10/2021 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/09/2021 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/09/2021. | ||
House | 06/08/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/07/2021 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2021 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2021 | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 06/01/2021 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/27/2021 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |