Senate | 06/10/2021 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021. | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/10/2021 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/10/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. | ||
House | 06/09/2021 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/08/2021 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2021 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |