Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/14/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2021
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2021
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2021
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 96 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2021
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2021
|
Reported favorably (7-1).
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2021
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2021
|
Reported favorably (13-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2021
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|