Senate | 05/26/2021 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Read by title and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2021 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2021 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2021 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |