House
|
03/31/2022
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Becomes Act No. 5.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Notice Senate voted to override the Governor's veto
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
By a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays, the Senate voted to override the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Notice House voted to override the Governor's veto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Veto message received and read. Rules suspended. By a vote of 72 yeas and 31 nays, having received two-thirds vote of elected members, veto overridden.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 62, nays 27, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 33. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/10/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/09/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/08/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (13-5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|