LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 1st Special Session
House
Bills
HB22
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB22
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 1st Special Session
Louisiana House Bill HB22
Action History
House
02/16/2022
Read third time by title, amended, by a vote of 53 yeas, 43 nays, the entire subject matter was tabled.
House
02/15/2022
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/16/2022.
House
02/15/2022
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
02/14/2022
Reported with amendments (10-7).
House
02/11/2022
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
House
02/10/2022
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.