House
|
03/09/2022
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 71, nays 28, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 02/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 29. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/08/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|