Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2022
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/21/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 26 yeas and 9 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 31. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 02/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported favorably (11-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 12 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and rejected.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|