Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 75, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Reported favorably (9-3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|