Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 55, nays 38. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Reported with amendments (8-6).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|