House
|
06/17/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 582.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 338 reported by the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment (7-1).
|
|
|