House
|
06/10/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 288.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received(#5541).
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice Senate recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice the House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; bill was recommited to Conference Committee.hb612
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
The vote by which the Conference Committee Report was adopted was reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
The House recommitted the bill to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. Having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Ward, Mizell, and Cathey.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Deshotel, Davis, and Selders.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were rejected. Conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 1038 reported by the Committee on Commerce (10-0).
|
|
|