LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB112
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB112
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB112
Action History
House
05/18/2022
Withdrawn from the files of the House.
House
05/18/2022
Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary.
House
03/14/2022
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
House
02/25/2022
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022.
House
02/21/2022
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
House
02/21/2022
Prefiled.