House
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date: 01/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 440.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|