House | 05/10/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2022. | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | Notice given. | ||
House | 05/09/2022 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2022. | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Reported favorably (10-0-1). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/25/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022. | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Prefiled. |