House
|
06/18/2022
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/05/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported with amendments (15-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported with amendments (8-3).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/25/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|